LLOYDS BANK FOUNDATION FOR ENGLAND & WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To be a leading grant maker supporting and working in partnership with recognised charitable organisations which help people, especially those who are disadvantaged or disabled, to play a fuller role in communities throughout England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£19,219,068
Donations and legacies | £17.87m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.24m | |
Other | £108.36k |
Total expenditure:
£24,220,619
Raising funds | £69.61k | |
Charitable activities | £24.15m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,263,483 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £69.61k | |
Charitable expenditure | £24.15m |
People

50 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
428 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 May 1986: Standard registration
- Lloyds Bank Foundation (Working name)
- LLOYDS TSB FOUNDATION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Ann Geraldine Limb DBE DL | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Laura Needham | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ajneet Jassey | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claud Leon George Williams | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHERRIE BIJA | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Bushra Anoud Ahmed | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Catherine Legg | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELIZABETH SUTHERLAND | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kamran Mallick | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Darren John Knight | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.90m | £24.61m | £19.36m | £16.46m | £19.22m | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.02m | £28.20m | £19.86m | £19.86m | £24.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.62m | £425.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £19.00m | £23.86m | £18.98m | £16.29m | £17.87m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £889.46k | £735.16k | £370.74k | £155.09k | £1.24m | |
|
Income - Other | £13.92k | £10.16k | £8.53k | £11.03k | £108.36k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £15.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £28.87m | £28.07m | £19.76m | £19.76m | £24.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £147.66k | £135.62k | £100.00k | £100.00k | £69.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £109.49k | £0 | £111.27k | £59.30k | £66.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £25.04m | £28.07m | £15.88m | £19.15m | £20.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £147.66k | £135.62k | £100.00k | £100.00k | £69.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £159.51k | £128.57k | £82.99k | £111.78k | £88.81k | |
|
Long-term investments | £42.27m | £37.61m | £33.13m | £13.52m | £14.73m | |
|
Other assets | £16.06m | £20.34m | £15.69m | £23.44m | £22.60m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £23.25m | £25.39m | £15.42m | £12.19m | £16.28m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/12/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/03/1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/2014
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL ASPECTS OF KNOWLEDGE BY MEANS OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO ) THE MAKING OF GRANTS, INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES, AND OTHER LIKE AWARDS. B) TO ADVANCE SCIENTIFIC OR MEDICAL RESEARCH, ON THE CONDITION THAT ALL USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH SCIENTIFIC OR MEDICAL RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED, AND EDUCATION IN SCIENTIFIC OR MEDICAL RESEARCH BY MEANS OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE MAKING OF GRANTS, INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES, AND OTHER LIKE AWARDS. C) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE ARTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
PRINCIPALLY ENGLAND WALES AND ISLE OF MAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOCIETY BUILDING
8 ALL SAINTS STREET
LONDON
N1 9RL
- Phone:
- 02073784610
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window