THE CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the proclamation of the Christian Gospel through the electronic media. Organising conferences and giving awards for excellence in broadcasting and related matters. Support of independent Christian broadcasters. Communication with Ofcom and other Government related agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 February 1987: Standard registration
- CBC (Working name)
- THE CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING COUNCIL (OF THE UNITED KINGDOM) (Previous name)
- THE CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING COUNCIL OF GREAT BRITAIN (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter David Wooding | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Roger John Bolton | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Jonathan Laurence Alderton-Ford | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher John Cole | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
OLAVE MARY CRAUFURD SNELLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25 | £25 | £39.90k | £562 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £86 | £406 | £1.92k | £3.97k | £4.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH DECEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 16TH MARCH 1989 14TH JUNE 1990 AND 3RD SEPTEMBER 1991 & 28 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO STIMULATE AND PROMOTE THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST BY MEANS OF RADIO AND TELEVISION BROADCASTING; THROUGH THE EXHIBITION OF FILMS VIDEOS AND D.V.D.S, THROUGH DISTRIBUTION OF RADIO CASSETTES AND RECORDS AND THROUGH THE PRINTED WORD
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
28, Old Park Road
Peverell
Plymouth
Devon
PL3 4PY
- Phone:
- 01752 225623
- Email:
- contact@cbc.org.uk
- Website:
-
cbc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window