SILOAM CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is to use medical aid, education, social and other relief as an expression of God's love. By funding these activities the organisation and its Directors believe that it can have a positive effect upon individuals who have become homeless, dispossessed of their possessions or opportunities of employment through natural causes or war.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Warwickshire
- Bulgaria
- Ghana
- Haiti
- India
- Israel
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Peru
- Philippines
- Portugal
- Romania
- Ukraine
- Vietnam
Governance
- 09 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Spademan | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER MICHAEL GALE | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JOSEPH ELD | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||
RICHARD PETER NORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.33k | £324.88k | £326.30k | £328.39k | £303.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.49k | £303.67k | £310.40k | £327.77k | £316.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION COMPANY INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
TO INITIATE, SUPPORT, ORGANISE, MAINTAIN, EQUIP, MANAGE OR ASSIST IN ANY WORK IN CONNECTION WITH THE TEACHING OF AND THE PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL EITHER AT HOME OR ABROAD AND BY ITSELF OR BY ANY OTHER BODY OR CHURCH OR PERSON OR PERSONS OF ANY DESCRIPTION AND WHETHER DENOMINATIONAL UNDENOMINATIONAL OR INDEPENDENT BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THE BIBLE; TO SUPPORT HOSPITAL, INSTITUTIONS FOR THE BLIND, DESTITUTE AND TO GRANT AND GIVE AID BOTH SPIRITUALLY AND MATERIALLY TO THE HOMELESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15a Newbold Street
Leamington Spa
Warwickshire
CV32 4HN
- Phone:
- 01926335037
- Email:
- info@siloam.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window