THE OPEN THEOLOGY TRUST

Charity Number: 327642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We aim to promote enterprises which engage religious ideas, values and actions with a wider cultural and political context. We support networks and activities in non-traditional forums of theological exploration and sponsor conferences, events, publishing and media enterprises.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,432
Total expenditure: £8,042

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SCM PRESS TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON RUTH WEBSTER Chair
None on record
The Venerable Mary Kathleen Rose Stallard Trustee 11 February 2016
MAECYMRU MERCHED A'R EGLWYS
Received: On time
PROFESSOR ELAINE LOUISE GRAHAM Trustee
BIAPT (BRITISH AND IRISH ASSOCIATION FOR PRACTICAL THEOLOGY)
Received: 39 days late
MODERN CHURCH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAURENCE, FRODSHAM
Received: On time
TIMOTHY ELSTON MCCLURE BA Trustee
None on record
REV DR MARY ELIZABETH COTES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.16k £65.10k £2.30k £3.31k £5.43k
Total expenditure £11.06k £2.89k £7.09k £7.95k £8.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
55 South Street
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 3NZ
Phone:
07725047318
Website:

No information available