WORLD TEAM (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY COMMUNICATION AND BY THE INSTRUCTION OF CHRISTIANS IN THEIR CHRISTIAN LIFE AND SERVICE. PROMOTE BETTER UNDERSTANDING IN THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 04 February 1988: Standard registration
- WORLDTEAM (UK) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE MMBAGO | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Olawale Akinrogunde | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|||||
James Tuffin | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jerry Moyer | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Volker Schnull | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernhard Ramseier | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.58k | £39.34k | £36.53k | £43.71k | £53.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.83k | £46.08k | £34.98k | £33.90k | £39.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/12/1987 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE COMMUNICATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND BY THE INSTRUCTION OF CHRISTIANS IN THEIR CHRISTIAN LIFE AND SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 THOMAS BAINES ROAD
LONDON
SW11 2HH
- Phone:
- 07946023101
- Email:
- mmbago@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window