THE INDEPENDENT DANCERS RESETTLEMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activities are the provision of retraining for professional dancers from the contributing member companies classified as Restricted and the independent freelance division classified as Unrestricted. Also contributions received, that are not from contributing member companies, but, specific to an award are classified as Restricted Independent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 March 1988: Standard registration
- 19 April 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 April 2017: Funds transferred to 1168958 DANCERS' CAREER DEVELOPMENT
- DANCERS' CAREER DEVELOPMENT (Working name)
- THE DANCERS RESETTLEMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £483.55k | £371.94k | £466.61k | £397.65k | £445.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £684.10k | £493.30k | £475.96k | £453.25k | £466.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 22 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 16 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 15 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING FOR PROFESSIONAL DANCERS WHO HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM DURING THE WHOLE OR PART OF THEIR CAREERS AS PROFESSIONAL DANCERS AND HAVE RECEIVED A FULL RECOGNISED DANCE TRAINING AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY FIND EMPLOYMENT OTHER THAN THAT OF A DANCER (B) TO SUPPORT ADVISE AND AID IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE THE PERSONS SPECIFIED IN SUB-CLAUSE (A) HEREOF AND THE WIVES AND CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE OR ARE ABOUT TO BE ENGAGED IN A COURSE OF EDUCATION OR TRAINING WITH A VIEW TO UNDERTAKING SUCH TRADE PROFESSION OR OCCUPATION AND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH SUPPORT ADVICE AND AID BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE (B) (I) AND (II) AND (C) OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window