THE JBG HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 327895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MAKES GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS RELATING TO ACCOMMODATION AND ALSO CONTRIBUTES TO THE PURCHASE OF BUILDINGS, FACILITIES THEREIN AND OPEN SPACE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,945
Total expenditure: £18,418

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BENJAMIN CONWAY Trustee 13 May 2021
THE PAPERWEIGHT TRUST
Received: On time
SARA CORMACK Trustee 21 December 2020
None on record
PETER TOBIN Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
ERIC SHAPIRO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.44k £5.55k £2.58k £7.27k £8.95k
Total expenditure £39.86k £58.57k £44.48k £47.98k £18.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
JEWISH COMMUNITY HOUSING ASSOCIATIO
HARMONY CLOSE
LONDON
NW11 0JJ
Phone:
02083814901
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available