EQUITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Principal activities at the present time are to provide welfare and educational grants for professional performers. The charity also provides the services of a welfare rights and debt adviser for the benefit of professional performers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 February 1989: Standard registration
- EQUITY TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Rogers | Chair | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Guy Chambers | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Daniel Hedges | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Carson Sims | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harold Finley | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||
David John Steele | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shenagh Govan | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shalom Lee-Ramsbottom | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Grainger | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Cummings Thompson | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Nigel Gilchrist | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £471.70k | £1.33m | £731.90k | £583.82k | £489.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £488.36k | £1.65m | £756.49k | £770.07k | £953.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £21.46k | £327.55k | £90.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £62.09k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.02m | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £224.33k | £404.35k | £493.72k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.59m | £677.83k | £694.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £60.99k | £78.66k | £75.46k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £23.02k | £19.52k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £120.00k | £0 | £63.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £28.88k | £78.66k | £37.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JANUARY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1989 AND 24 MAY 1995, AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 NOVEMBER 2008 as amended on 20 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS AND THE PROMOTION, PRESENTATION, PROTECTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF PERFORMING ARTS AND THE RAISING BY CHARITABLE MEANS OF FUNDING THEREFORE AND ITS PROVISION FOR SUCH PURPOSES. II) TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE WELFARE AND HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL) OF PROFESSIONAL PERFORMERS AND FORMER PERFORMERS (WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF BRITISH ACTORS EQUITY ASSOCIATION) THEIR RELATIVES AND DEPENDANTS AND OTHERS CONNECTED WITH THEM WHO ARE SICK OR IN NEED OF SUCH PROVISION BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AND TO RAISE AND DISBURSE FUNDS FOR SUCH PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Equity Charitable Trust
23 Alphabet Mews
LONDON
SW9 0FN
- Phone:
- 02078311926
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window