THE SQUIRES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation supports the following; Social Welfare - particularly the relief of need, hardship and distress, Community Development, work which supports Children, Young People and the Elderly, local Hospitals and Hospices and Christian Activities. Grants can be one-off or recurrent and are made primarily in Tyneside and Northumberland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 09 January 1984: Standard registration
- THE BENFIELD MOTORS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Squires | Chair |
|
||||||
Mark Squires | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|||||
LYNN SQUIRES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM SQUIRES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN SQUIRES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/03/2020 | 16/03/2021 | 16/03/2022 | 16/03/2023 | 16/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.30k | £118.20k | £81.32k | £231.70k | £191.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.62k | £118.63k | £80.60k | £134.08k | £227.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/03/1989 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2015
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY. 2. THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS, AGE OR SICKNESS. 3. THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 MIDDLE DRIVE
PONTELAND
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE20 9DH
- Phone:
- 07729689813
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window