MEDICAL EQUESTRIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing medical cover and training and related activities in an equestrian context i.e. horse and rider events by appropriately qualified doctors and related professionals. raising the profile of the need for proper medical training and cover at such events. promoting health and safety generally in an equestrian context.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 August 1989: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 July 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANDREW SIMPSON | Chair | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||||
James Pitt | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrews | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Megan Hardman | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £3.15k | £7.10k | £11.69k | £17.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £2.01k | £11.02k | £14.96k | £14.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR DOCTORS, OWNERS OF EQUESTRIAN ESTABLISHMENTS, ORGANISERS OF EQUESTRIAN EVENTS, RIDERS AND THOSE WHO ATTEND EQUESTRIAN EVENTS IN THE PREVENTION OF ACCIDENTS, AND THE PROPER ADMINISTRATION OF FIRST AID, AND THE EQUIPMENT BEST SUITED TO, AND NECESSARY FOR, FIRST AID IN EQUESTRIAN ACCIDENTS. 2 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION AND INCIDENCE OF EQUESTRIAN ACCIDENTS, AND INTO THE USE AND DEVELOPMENT OF SAFETY EQUIPMENT AND CLOTHING, AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beechcroft Barn
Upton Lovell
WARMINSTER
Wiltshire
BA12 0JW
- Phone:
- 07990515434
- Email:
- admin@medequestrian.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window