THE MUSICSPACE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a community based music therapy service for children, young people and adults throughout Bristol and the South West region
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £74,257 from 16 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 August 1989: Standard registration
- 03 November 2023: Funds received from 1114562 STOKES SINGERS
- BRISTOL MUSICSPACE (Working name)
- MUSICSPACE (Working name)
- HAMPSHIRE MUSICSPACE (Previous name)
- MUSICSPACE NORTH WEST (Previous name)
- MUSICSPACE WEST MIDLANDS (Previous name)
- NOTTINGHAM MUSICSPACE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Barry Davies | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise McKee | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Judith Sara Rose | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dolby | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martine Kim Smith | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Deborah Jane England | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.43k | £549.48k | £277.44k | £305.53k | £301.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.23k | £288.60k | £323.59k | £365.48k | £417.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £16.18k | £16.80k | £18.11k | £17.75k | £74.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.75k | £54.84k | £1.79k | £901 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £312.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £1.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £181.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £27 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £54.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £237.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £277.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £11.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 1989 AND AMENDED 12TH OCTOBER 1994 as amended on 31 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MUSIC THERAPY 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, COMPLEX HEALTH NEEDS AND LIFE-LIMITING CONDITIONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MUSIC THERAPY 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS OF MUSIC THERAPY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RAISING AWARENESS OF SUCH THERAPY BY COMMISSIONING AND PUBLISHING RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Henleaze House Business Centre
Henleaze House
13 Harbury Road
BRISTOL
BS9 4PN
- Phone:
- 01179531731
- Email:
- info@musicspace.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window