SALT OF THE EARTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Salt of the Earth (SOTE) was founded in 1988 to support the work of Non-Governmental Organisations (NGOs) in Tamil Nadu, India. SOTE currently supports programmes focused on women?s empowerment, income generation, health, education and environmental preservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- India
Governance
- 31 August 1989: Standard registration
- 13 June 2017: Funds received from 280811 GENESIS OSTEOPATHIC FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MURRAY ROY FRANKLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Jane Elizabeth Fielding | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON FIELDING OBE | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
BELINDA CALLAND | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ANNE WALKER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BRIAN WOODCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CELIA BARDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANET ELISTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID PETER BRADLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.06k | £184.11k | £218.24k | £141.66k | £208.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.12k | £164.61k | £217.07k | £155.53k | £172.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 AUGUST 1989
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROTECT HEALTH AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN UNDER DEVELOPED COUNTRIES (PARTICULARLY IN VILLAGES AND RURAL AREAS WITHIN SUCH COUNTRIES).
Area of benefit
UNDER DEVELOPED COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 SCRAPTOFT LANE
LEICESTER
LE5 2FE
- Phone:
- 0116 276 6439
- Email:
- info@sote.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window