BRITISH COMMERCIAL VEHICLE MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The operation of a Commercial Vehicle Museum and the maintaining of a substantial archive of the Commercial Vehicle Industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 March 1990: Standard registration
- 25 September 2024: Funds received from 262281 THE ENGERT WATFORD MOTOR MUSEUM
- LEYLAND DAF HERITAGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bharath Ramaswamy | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Louise Mayo | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Jukes | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Geoffrey Southworth | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith James Ellison | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Forrest | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Haley | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lesley Melia | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Anthony McKevitt | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARVEY BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIVE ROBERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.59k | £351.91k | £192.39k | £228.04k | £351.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.74k | £233.31k | £304.93k | £229.57k | £236.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £65.12k | £19.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 MARCH 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 16 AUGUST 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS; (1) TO MAINTAIN PREMISES AS A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE MUSEUM WITH WORKSHOPS ANCILLARY THERETO TO MARK THE ROLE OF LEYLAND IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE BRITISH COMMERCIAL VEHICLE WITHIN THE AREA OF THE CENTRAL LANCASHIRE NEWTOWN AND THE TOWNSHIP OF LEYLAND. (2) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION A COMMERCIAL MOTOR VEHICLE MUSEUM AND TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF COMMERCIAL MOTOR VEHICLES MANUFACTURED AND SOLD BY THE BRITISH MOTOR INDUSTRY TOGETHER WITH THE HISTORIC ARCHIVES AND ARTIFACTS RELATING TO THE BRITISH MOTOR INDUSTRY WHERE SUCH VEHICLES, ARCHIVES AND ARTIFACTS ARE OF ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE. (3) TO EXHIBIT TO THE PUBLIC SUCH VEHICLES AND ARTIFACTS AS AFORESAID BY MEANS OF EITHER TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT EXHIBITIONS AND TO DEMONSTRATE AND ASSIST IN DEMONSTRATING TO THE PUBLIC THE WORKING AND OPERATION OF ANY SUCH VEHICLES, ARTIFACTS AND EQUIPMENT AND ALSO TO PROVIDE ACESS TO THE PUBLIC OF THE ARCHIVE MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Commercial Vehicle Museum
King Street
Leyland
PR25 2LE
- Phone:
- 01772 451011
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window