CHS FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public and, in particular, those persons involved in the management and delivery of supported housing services, by providing, or assisting, in the provision of education, training, and related services, and thereby contributing to high standards of service and support within the sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 July 1990: Standard registration
- 21 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 21 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1187077 ST PETROCS
- 21 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1043921 ST PAUL'S HOSTEL
- 21 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1149659 NEW HOPE WORCESTERSHIRE
- 21 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1191566 Wyre Forest and South Worcestershire Nightstop and...
- C S H S (Working name)
- CSHS (Working name)
- CSHS LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE CENTRE FOR SHELTERED HOUSING STUDIES (1990) LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.36k | £6.75k | £9.83k | £30.11k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 June 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/05/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/08/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE PERSONS INVOLVED IN THE MANAGEMENT AND DELIVERY OF SUPPORTED HOUSING SERVICES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RELATED SERVICES, AND THEREBY CONTRIBUTING TO HIGH STANDARDS OF SERVICE AND SUPPORT WITHIN THE SECTOR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window