THE ROWLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1062148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General grant-making activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £75,688
Total expenditure: £427,673

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Gloucestershire
  • Herefordshire
  • Shropshire
  • Warwickshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN JAMES CROCKATT SMITH Chair 27 April 2015
THE KILDARE TRUST
Received: On time
QUEEN ELIZABETH ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Patrick Wrixon Trustee 19 April 2021
THE CART SHED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rebecca Widdowson Trustee 03 February 2020
None on record
Lady DIANA CHARLOTTE CRABTREE Trustee 21 February 2014
YOUTH ORGANISATIONS IN UNIFORM WEST MIDLANDS CIO
Received: On time
MR GARY BARBER Trustee 06 September 2011
THE MICHAEL MARSH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MONTAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DMF ELLIS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £114.57k £90.31k £77.63k £79.92k £75.69k
Total expenditure £365.20k £335.44k £397.64k £504.17k £427.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PEAR TREE COTTAGE
YARRINGTON ROAD
ALFRICK
WORCESTER
WR6 5EX
Phone:
07812743485
Website:

No information available