Financial history LEARNING DISABILITY WALES - ANABLEDD DYSGU CYMRU

Charity number: 1062858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.52m £2.27m £2.78m £1.90m £961.12k
Total expenditure £2.44m £2.14m £2.66m £1.80m £999.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A
Income from government grants £2.29m £400.00k £385.53k £400.00k £400.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £308.19k £7.05k £419.60k £409.50k £417.45k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.21m £1.86m £2.36m £1.48m £529.68k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.99k £460 £2.62k £3.83k £14.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £34.07k £9.50k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.44m £2.14m £2.66m £1.80m £999.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.15k £6.15k £5.97k £7.10k £6.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.87m £0 £1.88m £1.01m £177.06k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0