Financial history HEADWAY CARDIFF AND SOUTH EAST WALES

Charity number: 1063221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £363.69k £359.37k £321.53k £444.83k £656.13k
Total expenditure £348.95k £285.02k £333.54k £382.92k £472.91k
Income from government contracts £195.39k £168.13k £179.25k £230.62k £276.06k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £17.37k £21.14k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £281.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £28.09k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £342.48k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.55k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £200.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £456.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £16.74k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0