TEENAGE CANCER TRUST

Charity number: 1062559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The long term objective of Teenage Cancer Trust is to make sure young people's lives don't stop because they have cancer. This is achieved by 1. The development, construction and support of teenage cancer units 2. The provision and development of regional services in connection with TYA cancers 3. The provision of funding for national initiatives for the benefit of all young people with cancer

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 1997: Standard registration
  • 22 February 2017: Funds received from 1049851 THE PATRICIA MARY GAMMON TRUST
  • 01 November 2018: Funds received from 1150083 THE JANE KASLER FOUNDATION
  • 11 February 2019: Funds received from 1141849 NEVER GIVE UP
  • 25 August 2022: Funds received from 327529 THE MOSS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 15 February 2023: Funds received from 1147442 PETER'S PLACE
  • 05 April 2023: Funds received from 1117581 BARNSLEY CANCER AFTERCARE
  • 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1178893 RHYS' DONATION FOUNDATION
  • 24 January 2024: Funds received from 268645 MRS S L CHAMBERS' CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL SPANSWICK Chair 05 January 2012
None on record
Professor Rachael Emma Hough Trustee 03 November 2022
None on record
Gurinderjit Kaur Carr Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
Susan Jane Morgan Trustee 04 May 2021
RJC PRODUCTIONS LTD
Received: On time
Richard Martin Baillie Waterworth Trustee 11 February 2021
None on record
Jeremy Paul Seigal Trustee 18 July 2019
None on record
Jeremy Harmsworth Shute Trustee 20 July 2015
None on record
Varda Shine Trustee 20 July 2015
None on record
Caren Ayre Hindmarsh Trustee 20 July 2015
None on record
RICHARD BARRY ROSENBERG Trustee
None on record
RONNIE HARRIS Trustee
H & T CLIENTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ILLSLEY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ROBYN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HARRIS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.35m £15.63m £16.34m £18.66m £16.12m
Total expenditure £17.47m £14.96m £15.75m £19.01m £21.65m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.13m £57.75k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £14.68m £13.79m £15.59m £14.93m £13.88m
Income - Other trading activities £3.60m £679.37k £643.29k £3.57m £2.03m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £47.42k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £74.33k £32.70k £3.37k £155.25k £214.76k
Income - Other £0 £1.13m £57.75k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £430.62k £235.35k £510.30k £258.60k £404.07k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.55m £9.79m £10.14m £11.26m £13.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.91m £5.17m £5.61m £7.74m £8.61m
Expenditure - Governance £510.85k £527.11k £620.68k £804.24k £1.00m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £14.42k £0 £178.00k £154.00k £136.00k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £7.91m £7.09m
Other assets £16.85m £18.45m £18.17m £9.81m £6.21m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.99m £2.91m £2.22m £2.30m £3.26m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TEENAGE CANCER TRUST
THE PLACE
175 HIGH HOLBORN
LONDON
WC1V 7AA
Phone:
02076120370
Website:

teenagecancertrust.org