THE FAWCETT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fawcett Society is the leading UK charity campaigning for gender equality and women's rights. We publish compelling research to educate, inform and lead the debate; we bring together politicians, academics, grassroots activists and wider civil society to develop innovative, practical solutions; we work with employers & in schools and we campaign with women and men to make change happen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£550,391
Donations and legacies | £448.37k | |
Charitable activities | £21.03k | |
Other trading activities | £73.79k | |
Investments | £6.04k | |
Other | £1.17k |
Total expenditure:
£683,593
Raising funds | £69.16k | |
Charitable activities | £614.43k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £69.16k | |
Charitable expenditure | £614.43k |
People

9 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- FAWCETT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anum Qaisar | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Ayliffe | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Deborah Roberts | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca McMurray | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Farah Nazeer | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Alexander | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paola Uccellari | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Sheldon | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Harman | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Latif | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Resham Kotecha | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £936.97k | £1.09m | £931.42k | £693.60k | £550.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £922.37k | £1.03m | £983.32k | £657.23k | £683.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £16.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £723 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £866.91k | £978.67k | £878.61k | £598.47k | £448.37k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £37.16k | £80.88k | £41.90k | £84.86k | £73.79k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £26.78k | £10.07k | £10.91k | £6.95k | £21.03k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £987 | £679 | £6 | £3.33k | £6.04k | |
|
Income - Other | £5.15k | £21.71k | £0 | £0 | £1.17k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.00k | £81.98k | £3.00k | £15.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £836.55k | £924.65k | £901.35k | £583.10k | £614.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £85.82k | £101.55k | £81.97k | £74.13k | £69.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.18k | £7.80k | £50.68k | £45.21k | £32.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.01k | £5.65k | £4.13k | £2.62k | £3.05k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £528.14k | £754.00k | £601.66k | £592.53k | £469.40k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £39.52k | £198.20k | £96.24k | £49.23k | £59.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS 2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR EQUALITY BETWEEN WOMEN AND MEN AND TO ELIMINATE GENDER DISCRIMINATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: 2.1.1 RAISING AWARENESS OF ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, USE OF THE MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; 2.1.2 CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND PUBLICISING THE RESULTS OF THE SAME TO THE PUBLIC; 2.1.3 ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; 2.1.4 PROMOTING ATTITUDES, CUSTOMS AND PRACTICES IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY; AND 2.1.5 PROVIDING OR FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH TRAINING, COUNSELLING, ADVICE OR GUIDANCE IN RELATION TO CHALLENGING AND ELIMINATING GENDER DISCRIMINATION AND PROMOTING EQUALITY.?
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fawcett Society
27-31 Carlton Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 2DG
- Phone:
- 07709085840
- Email:
- info@fawcettsociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window