ACTION BY CHRISTIANS AGAINST TORTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Human Rights action
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 November 1998: Standard registration
- ACAT (UK) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Bowen | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Burr | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MORRIS JOHNS | Trustee | 28 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
MAURICE DYSON | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Derek Lewis | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Audrey Cynthia Wells | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.06k | £6.30k | £5.60k | £6.09k | £6.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.17k | £4.07k | £4.26k | £8.55k | £5.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1998, AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC (AND MEMBERS OF CHURCHES IN PARTICULAR) ABOUT THE EXISTENCE, EXTENT AND EVILS OF TORTURE AND THE DEATH PENALTY. (B) FOR REASONS OF CHRISTIAN FAITH TO WORK FOR THE WORLDWIDE ABOLITION OF TORTURE AND EXTRAJUDICIAL EXECUTION. (C) TO PROVIDE HELP AND SUPPORT FOR VICTIMS OF TORTURE AND FAMILIES OF THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN TORTURED, EXECUTED, OR FACE THE THREAT OF DEATH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Higher Woolbrook Park
SIDMOUTH
EX10 9ED
- Phone:
- 01395577669
- Email:
- uk.acat@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window