Trustees HUTTON BUSCEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1091730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Mendham Trustee 11 February 2025
None on record
Susan Barbara Bird Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Clare Louise Hudson Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Tracy Marie Hansell Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Carol Ann Barnes Trustee 04 March 2021
None on record
Shirley Anne Doyle Trustee 27 March 2018
None on record
Shirley Cooke Trustee 27 March 2018
None on record