YOUTH TALK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Talk offers community counselling at no charge to 13-25 year olds who live, work or are educated in St Albans, Harpenden and surrounding area. We also provide an information/signposting service to both young people and their parents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £133,924 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 July 1997: Standard registration
- YOUTH TALK (Working name)
- YOUTH TALK 14-25 (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Twidell | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Wendy Targett-Adams | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Kiernan | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Hemsi | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Huw Evans | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Anne Cashin | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Elizabeth Fryer | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Mary Dalley | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER CLULOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS MARGARET THIRLWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.91k | £341.15k | £376.86k | £479.37k | £470.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.04k | £298.25k | £328.83k | £442.12k | £569.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £104.46k | £113.10k | £120.00k | £129.94k | £133.92k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £129.94k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5TH JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 DEC 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO DISADVANTAGED AND DISTRESSED YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN OR CONNECTED WITH ST. ALBANS AND DISTRICT, IN THE FORM OF COUNSELLING, PSYCHOTHERAPY AND RELATED SERVICES. (B) TO PREVENT OR ALLEVIATE MENTAL ILL HEALTH, PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTURBANCE AND MALADAPTATION IN ADULT AND FUTURE FAMILY AND SOCIAL RELATIONSHIPS. (C) TO PROMOTE EMOTIONAL WELL BEING.
Area of benefit
ST. ALBANS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 London Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL1 1NG
- Phone:
- 01727868684
- Email:
- info@youthtalk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window