OLDLAND MILL TRUST

Charity number: 1072911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To restore Oldland Windmill, which was built around 1700, and ceased to operate commercially in 1912. The Windmill has now been restored to full working order and is in regular use grinding flour for sale to raise funds, which help pay the costs of maintenance and opening the Mill to the public and for educational visits.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £20,632
Total expenditure: £22,005

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OLDLAND WINDMILL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Douglas Hewitt Trustee 09 July 2024
OLDLAND MILL CIO
Received: 7 days late
JUDY ELIZABETH POINTING Trustee 21 June 2022
OLDLAND MILL CIO
Received: 7 days late
Annette Brown Trustee 21 June 2022
OLDLAND MILL CIO
Received: 7 days late
David William Bunting Trustee 21 June 2022
OLDLAND MILL CIO
Received: 7 days late
JULIET MARY STRANGE Trustee 25 November 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CLAYTON AND KEYMER
Received: On time
THE TERRYS CROSS TRUST
Received: On time
OLDLAND MILL CIO
Received: 7 days late
Andrew Owen MACKAY FRICS Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
PROFESSOR FREDERICK JAMES MAILLARDET Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
Andrew John Heber PEARCE Trustee 06 June 2016
OLDLAND MILL CIO
Received: 7 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £19.86k £17.43k £12.48k £48.84k £20.63k
Total expenditure £19.72k £17.43k £20.72k £19.96k £22.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 February 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 21 February 2024 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 11 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
103 Dale Avenue
HASSOCKS
West Sussex
BN6 8LR
Phone:
01273843700
Website:

oldlandwindmill.co.uk