THE WALTHAM ABBEY ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The company's principal object and activity during the year was to develop and manage the site and collections of the Waltham Abbey Royal Gunpowder Mills, provide programmes of education for schoolchildren, and open days for the general public to visit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£556,096
Donations and legacies | £328.52k | |
Charitable activities | £227.14k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £438 |
Total expenditure:
£656,287
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £621.59k | |
Other | £34.69k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £34.69k | |
Charitable expenditure | £621.59k |
People

8 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 20 June 1997: Standard registration
- ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS (Working name)
- THE OPERATING CHARITABLE COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Baxter | Chair | 07 April 2018 |
|
|||||
James Andrew Richardson | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ross McIver | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £835.27k | £306.64k | £417.55k | £488.99k | £556.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £966.00k | £506.88k | £581.03k | £652.54k | £656.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £62.77k | £12.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £194.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £328.52k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £17.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £511.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £227.14k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £112.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £438 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £923.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £621.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £42.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.69k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.81m | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.16m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £144.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £174.80k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £87.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £112.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 December 2020 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 December 2020 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 OCT 2019 as amended on 20 Oct 2021 as amended on 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE MANAGE RESEARCH CONSERVE AND DISPLAY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE (A) WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN ALL THAT LAND AT WALTHAM ABBEY ESSEX MORE PARTICULARLY SHOWN EDGED RED ON THE PLAN ANNEXED TO A TRANSFER DATED 27TH MARCH 1997 AND MADE BETWEEN WALTHAM ABBEY TRUST COMPANY LIMITED (REGISTERED COMPANY NUMBER 3325864) AND THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE TOGETHER WITH INTER ALIA THE ARCHAEOLOGICAL REMAINS BUILDINGS ROADS PATHWAYS AND WATERWAYS SITUATED THEREON ("WALTHAM ABBEY ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS") IN THE FORM OF ANCIENT MONUMENTS LISTED BUILDINGS AND FEATURES OF PARTICULAR HISTORIC OR ARCHAEOLOGICAL INTEREST; AND (B) THE NATURAL ASPECT FEATURES AND BIRD ANIMAL TREE AND PLANT LIFE OF THE WALTHAM ABBEY ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE PUBLIC RELATING TO THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF GUNPOWDER EXPLOSIVES PROPELLANTS AND BALLISTIC AND OTHER MISSILES AND THE PRESERVATION HISTORY ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE WALTHAM ABBEY ROYAL GUNPOWDER MILLS (INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AND ACQUISITION OF EXHIBITS FOR AN INTERPRETATIVE AND EDUCATION CENTRE FOR THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT GUNPOWDER PROPELLANTS EXPLOSIVES PROJECTILES BALLISTIC AND OTHER MISSILES AND A CENTRE FOR TRAINING DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES) AND TO CONDUCT OR CAUSE TO BE CONDUCTED RESEARCH INTO SUCH MATTERS AND TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF;
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Gunpowder Mills
Beaulieu Drive
WALTHAM ABBEY
EN9 1JY
- Phone:
- 01992707370
- Email:
- fionaebaxter@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window