HELMSLEY WALLED GARDEN LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration and preservation of 5 acre walled garden. Horticultural education and training, particularly for young persons and those with learning or physical disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £6,900 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Saunders | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Hook | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Aston | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
John Antony Batty | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Lawton | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Barstow | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BREWSTER | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.46k | £229.28k | £291.07k | £300.57k | £302.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.38k | £162.24k | £218.46k | £320.23k | £293.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.00k | £34.52k | £57.44k | £6.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 OCTOBER 1998 AND 14 JANUARY 1999 as amended on 25 Jun 2021 as amended on 06 Jun 2024 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the public in all matters relating to horticulture, gardening skills and therapeutic horticulture through the development and maintenance of an historic walled garden, providing a supportive therapeutic space for volunteers and enhancing the physical and emotional health and wellbeing of everyone who uses and visits the garden.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLEVELAND WAY
HELMSLEY
YORK
YO62 5AH
- Phone:
- 01439771427
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window