THE ROTHSAY EDUCATION CENTRE (BEDFORD) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL NEEDS PRIMARILY FOR PEOPLE OVER 50 AND NOT IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 August 1997: Standard registration
- REC (Working name)
- THE RETIREMENT EDUCATION CENTRE (BEDFORD) LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANOJ GUPTA | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Jillian Margaret Lane | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ingrid Greenhow | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Outen | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Barnes | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hazel Woodward | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barber | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Medaney | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Juliana Lacey | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £348.72k | £273.43k | £187.07k | £201.83k | £263.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £502.86k | £408.12k | £177.52k | £201.68k | £237.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/08/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/01/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/02/2016 as amended on 24 Nov 2022 as amended on 24 Nov 2022 as amended on 24 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION MAINLY OF PERSONS OVER 50 AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF THEIR LIVES.
Area of benefit
BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rothsay Education Centre Ltd
6 ROTHSAY GARDENS
BEDFORD
MK40 3QB
- Phone:
- 01234302203
- Email:
- admin@recbedford.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window