THE DYNA AND FALA WEINSTOCK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity donates funds to worthy causes in the UK and Israel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Nottingham City
- Israel
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISRAEL WEINSTOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER JONATHAN SWIMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID KRASNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.53k | £137.91k | £157.71k | £129.65k | £118.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07m | £1.57m | £707.32k | £561.74k | £423.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF VARIATION DATED 4TH JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
FOR MEDICAL PROJECTS PRINCIPALLY IN RELATION TO PROVIDING BLOOD CLINICS AND WORK TOWARDS THE ALLEVIATION OF SYMPTOMS OF BLOOD DISORDERS AND RESEARCH INTO AND DEVELOPMENT OF CURES AND TREATMENTS FOR SUFFERERS OF BLOOD DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/0 Uromet Ltd
Ground Floor
Churchill House
120 Bunns Lane
Mill Hill
London
- Phone:
- 02089520101
- Email:
- iw@uromet.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window