Financial history WYMONDHAM SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 1065005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.03k £5.93k £7.92k £18.71k £16.50k
Total expenditure £6.63k £3.85k £9.41k £12.27k £14.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k