KEEP BRITAIN TIDY

Charity number: 1071737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our Intent: To inspire the people of Britain to eliminate litter and end waste for now and future generations. We will fight for people's right to live and work in places they can be proud of and prosper in, acting as a catalyst for change.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 September 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ENCAMS (Working name)
  • ENVIRONMENTAL CAMPAIGNS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vanessa Maselino Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Muhammad Ali Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Lydia Charlotte Elizabeth Burns Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Raymond Mills Trustee 16 April 2019
NEWCASTLE THEATRE ROYAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
REDHILLS CIO
Received: On time
Francis Vincent Hugh Neate Trustee 25 March 2019
THE FORTUNE CENTRE OF RIDING THERAPY
Received: 108 days late
Kresse Wesling Trustee 15 November 2018
None on record
MRS PHILIPPA ANDERSON Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
Suzy Brain England OBE Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.86m £4.34m £5.20m £16.94m £15.99m
Total expenditure £4.83m £3.83m £4.85m £10.90m £13.43m
Income from government contracts £890.39k £1.73m £427.41k £1.88m £659.43k
Income from government grants £9.00k £75.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £586.49k £808.20k £835.76k £977.74k £2.53m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.26m £3.52m £4.36m £15.92m £13.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.72k £9.00k £367 £39.57k £209.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.71m £3.74m £4.75m £10.84m £13.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £165.05k £128.33k £135.78k £96.69k £144.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £120.00k £91.00k £104.00k £64.00k £82.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £114.81k £80.90k £168.69k £151.53k £156.47k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £3.18m £3.38m £4.00m £7.22m £14.35m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£4.44m -£4.97m -£3.80m -£1.89m -£2.41m
Total liabilities £1.49m £1.61m £2.43m £2.24m £6.96m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Keep Britain Tidy
Elizabeth House
Southgate
WIGAN
WN3 4EX
Phone:
01942612619