Financial history BANSANG HOSPITAL APPEAL

Charity Number: 1064469
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £151.15k £105.38k £97.49k £118.54k £129.32k
Total expenditure £146.88k £97.06k £106.88k £119.31k £129.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A