BANSANG HOSPITAL APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Bansang Hospital Appeal is to provide support to Bansang Hospital and the people of the surrounding area in The Gambia by supplying medical equipment, pharmaceuticals and other humanitarian aid. In particular the Appeal has built an 80 bed Children's Ward, a 48 bed Female Ward, upgraded staff accommodation blocks and built operating theatre suites for obstetrics and general use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- The Gambia
Governance
- 18 September 1997: Standard registration
- 04 March 2020: Funds received from 1129241 THE GAMBIA UPCOUNTRY DEVELOPMENT CHARITY
- BANGANG HOSPITAL APPEAL (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANITA JANE SMITH MBE MRG | Chair |
|
||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM HYDE HARVEY BSC FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.15k | £105.38k | £97.49k | £118.54k | £129.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.88k | £97.06k | £106.88k | £119.31k | £129.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2023 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2023 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 November 2022 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN BANSANG, THE GAMBIA
Area of benefit
BANSANG, THE GAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 THE LEYS
ORLINGBURY
KETTERING
NN14 1JE
- Phone:
- 01933679001
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window