Financial history ST LAURENCE EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1063808
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.80m £14.60m £16.92m £17.59m £16.35m
Total expenditure £16.74m £14.11m £15.30m £15.27m £15.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £424.78k £564.17k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £483.68k £371.54k £1.28m £3.43m £1.61m
Income - Other trading activities £22.25k £3.34k £3.11k £123.15k £403.10k
Income - Charitable activities £13.87m £13.66m £15.63m £13.92m £14.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.09k £1.37k £13.56k £119.70k £226.32k
Income - Other £424.78k £564.17k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £70.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.66m £14.11m £15.30m £15.27m £15.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £77.76k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £130.10k £74.29k £54.05k £54.39k £14.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0