WORTHING PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 August 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Holmes | Chair | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dack | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Best | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Elvet Lewis | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.77k | £2.87k | £24.88k | £24.83k | £22.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.54k | £2.96k | £25.85k | £20.76k | £32.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8 AUGUST 1997.
Charitable objects
ARE TO PROMOTE , IMPROVE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF ORCHESTRAL AND INSTRUMENTAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR MUSICIANS TO REHEARSE MUSIC AND PERFORM MUSIC AT SUCH CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 St. Wilfreds Road
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN14 8BA
- Phone:
- 01903236927
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window