ASIA HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE AIMS OF THE CHARITY ARE - TO PROMOTE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF ASIAN COUNTRIES AND SOCIETIES, THEIR CULTURES, ARTS AND RELIGIONS - TO FOSTER CLOSER COMMUNICATION BETWEEN THE PEOPLES OF ASIA AND THE UK - TO EDUCATE THE CHILDREN OF THE UK ABOUT THE COUNTRIES OF ASIA IN PREPARATION FOR THE WORLD OF TOMORROW IN WHICH ASIA WILL PLAY A LEADING ROLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,973,834
Donations and legacies | £150.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.69m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £129.16k | |
Other | £991 |
Total expenditure:
£2,387,825
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £430.24k | |
Other | £1.96m |
£294,115 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.96m | |
Charitable expenditure | £430.24k |
People

17 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Stephen Keith Green | Chair | 12 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Dominic Stephen Barton | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Devassy Chittilapilly | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Buchanan | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yuval Atsmon | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dee Poon | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK WONG | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Alan James Belfield | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tanuj KAPILASHRAMI | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Shen Yuhong Wang | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward Knapp | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sir Sherard Cowper-Coles | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26m | £1.17m | £1.18m | £1.86m | £1.97m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.31m | £1.77m | £1.46m | £1.87m | £2.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £78.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £155.05k | £166.26k | £161.50k | £150.00k | £150.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £940.84k | £1.56m | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £61.52k | £85.70k | £0 | £0 | £1.69m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £165.88k | £85.44k | £81.37k | £66.50k | £129.16k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.87m | £833.35k | £0 | £79.42k | £991 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.16m | £226.08k | £253.61k | £366.76k | £430.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £23.90k | £0 | £22.83k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.51k | £21.71k | £49.00k | £91.63k | £100.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £23.90k | £0 | £22.83k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.15m | £1.52m | £1.21m | £1.48m | £1.96m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.84m | £9.74m | £10.11m | £10.01m | £9.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.65m | £3.38m | £3.72m | £3.04m | £3.21m | |
|
Other assets | £1.02m | £1.14m | £770.21k | £698.36k | £647.37k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.06m | £4.93m | £4.75m | £4.64m | £5.02m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 MARCH 2005 AND 05 JULY 2007 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit to educate the public in: 4.1.1 the knowledge and understanding of the peoples and countries of the continent of Asia and of their past and present social and economic development; and 4.1.2 the appreciation of Asian culture, arts, philosophy and history, by such means as the Trustees may from time to time determine. Asia means those regions of the world which on the first day of November one thousand nine hundred and seventy six were bordered on the north by the USSR but including Soviet Central Asia and Mongolia, on the west by the Caspian, Black and Mediterranean Seas, the River Nile and the Red Sea and the Indian Ocean, on the south by the Indian Ocean extending through to the Timor and Arafura Seas, to the north of Australia and on the east by the Pacific Ocean thereby including Middle and Near Eastern countries from Turkey to the Arabian peninsula the Indian sub- continent and adjoining countries, the Malay peninsula, Indonesia and the Philippines, South-east Asia, China, Korea and Japan and the islands of the China Sea, the Pacific Ocean and the Indian Ocean which either culturally or geographically relate to the Asian mainland such as the Maldives in the Indian Ocean and the Ryukyu Islands in the Pacific Ocean.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 NEW CAVENDISH STREET
LONDON
W1G 7LP
- Phone:
- 02073075461
- Email:
- enquiries@asiahouse.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window