Governance CARE FOR THE FAMILY
Charity number: 1066905
Up to date
Registration history:
- 17 December 1997: Standard registration
- 06 April 2016: Funds received from 1113091 FOUNDATIONS WEST MIDLANDS
- 16 February 2023: Funds received from 1055406 THE SANCTUARY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 13 March 2023: Funds received from 1173299 FAITHLIFE CHURCH
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1099239 INSIGHTS FOR LIFE
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1099239 INSIGHTS FOR LIFE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- LETSDOLIFE (Previous name)
- NATIONAL COUPLE SUPPORT NETWORK (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.