THE MODERN HUMANITIES RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote advanced study and research in the humanities and modern languages through the publication of journals and books, the encouragement of postgraduate research, and the provision of grants through funding schemes for conference organisation, research fellowships and postdoctoral support. Postgraduates are given free membership of the Association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MHRA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR DEREK FREDERICK CONNON Chair
None on record
Dr Dora Elizabeth Osborne Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Dr Jane-Marie Collins Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Dr DANIELA OMLOR Trustee 23 July 2024
LINCOLN COLLEGE OXFORD
Received: On time
Dr Richard Neil Adelman Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Dr Adam Paul Lind Hansen Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Dr Sean Martin Williams Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Professor Thomas Baldwin Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
Dr Jessica Mary Goodman Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record
Dr Claire Noelle Moran Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Professor Muireann Mary Maguire Trustee 15 May 2021
PENGUIN COLLECTORS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Guillem Colom-Montero Trustee 13 February 2021
None on record
Professor Simon Mark Dixon Trustee 17 October 2020
None on record
Professor Ben Bollig Trustee 20 October 2018
ST CATHERINE'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
JEREMY FRANCIS WONG Trustee 24 November 2016
None on record
Professor Jonathan James Long Trustee 08 November 2016
None on record
Dr Simon Rodway Trustee 17 October 2015
None on record
PROFESSOR GUIDO BONSAVER Trustee 11 October 2014
MASTER FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF PEMBROKE COLLEGE
Received: On time
Professor Duncan Graham Wheeler Trustee 11 October 2014
None on record
Dr ANN MARIE LEWIS Trustee 06 May 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR ANDREW HADFIELD Trustee
None on record
Professor CHLOE EDWINA MAGDALEN PAVER Trustee
None on record
DOCTOR BARBARA BURNS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £695.84k £619.74k £652.43k £629.33k £708.98k
Total expenditure £731.14k £758.61k £668.77k £824.02k £762.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £608.39k £551.25k £568.00k £546.58k £558.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £87.45k £68.49k £84.44k £82.75k £150.54k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £668.35k £716.17k £618.76k £779.24k £712.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £62.79k £42.44k £50.01k £44.77k £50.14k
Expenditure - Governance £64.10k £68.07k £73.39k £196.60k £71.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £213.81k £222.85k £182.40k £172.04k £138.34k
Expenditure - Investment management £62.79k £42.44k £50.01k £44.77k £50.14k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £1.85k £924
Long-term investments £6.44m £7.12m £7.99m £6.74m £6.65m
Other assets £881.84k £808.95k £878.60k £823.88k £1.09m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£49.29k -£85.65k -£88.61k -£185.00k -£158.55k
Total liabilities £183.23k £171.70k £210.28k £216.85k £222.97k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 11 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 14 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 02 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
59 BRIDLE WAY
GRANTCHESTER
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 9NY
Phone:
01223845512