SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF STOCKPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities focus on the advancement of the Baha'i Faith and belief in the essential oneness of the world's revealed religions and on Baha'i ideals of human brotherhood through various means including devotional meetings, children's classes, youth activities, study sessions and interfaith involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 October 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOOSHIN BIRCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katherine Yarnot | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elham Hakiman | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Sarmah | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayla Doostdar-Smith | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Homeyra Doostdar Smith | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ECKERSLEY | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
HOMA SALEHI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN SMITH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £8.68k | £9.26k | £11.98k | £13.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £8.49k | £10.06k | £12.08k | £14.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1997. CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE OF NAME 29 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BAHA'I FAITH AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THAT FAITH. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (WHETHER BAHA'I OR NOT) AND GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
STOCKPORT AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 RUTLAND GATE
LONDON
SW7 1PD
- Phone:
- 02075842566
- Email:
- lsa@stockportbahais.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window