THE BUCKFASTLEIGH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acts as an umbrella organisation for local community initiatives, such as the Valiant Soldier Museum and the Buckfastleigh Wool Festival. Acts as a enabler of community heritage and education activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 05 May 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven John Burch | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Denley-Jones | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Lilian Phillips | Trustee | 16 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Montgomery Parker | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Browning | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Janet Elizabeth Parrott MBE | Trustee | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judith Marguerite Hart | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.58k | £26.86k | £7.11k | £15.96k | £17.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.40k | £9.25k | £8.14k | £10.24k | £24.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.42k | £25.42k | N/A | £4.00k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 15TH JANUARY 1998. as amended on 27 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM. B) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A GARDEN AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BUCKFASTLEIGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS FOR USE IN RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT WILL BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 Fore Street
BUCKFASTLEIGH
TQ11 0BS
- Phone:
- 01364 644522
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window