THE SWINFEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is now closed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Antarctica
- Armenia
- Bangladesh
- Belize
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- China
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- East Timor
- Egypt
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Guyana
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Israel
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Laos
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Lithuania
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Micronesia
- Mongolia
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Helena
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Yemen
- Zambia
Governance
- 21 October 1999: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- SCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.18k | £63.77k | £32.44k | £35.81k | £44.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.57k | £35.56k | £26.61k | £36.02k | £29.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 22 JANUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES 0IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PROVISION OF RELIEF AND/OR TREATMENT FOR ANYONE SUFFERING FROM ANY SUCH INJURY, AILMENT, COMPLAINT OR DISABILITY EITHER BY DIRECT GRANT TO ANY SUCH SUFFERER OR BY PAYMENT TO ANY EXISTING OR FUTURE FUND, FOUNDATION, HOSPITAL, INSTITUTION, CORPORATE BODY OR TRUST ENGAGED IN SUCH RELIEF AND/OR TREATMENT. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME TO THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window