Financial history THE WORTH FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1068782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £962.86k £695.25k £898.78k £818.05k £654.29k
Total expenditure £775.19k £691.60k £825.16k £888.86k £625.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.14k
Income from government grants £12.25k £32.60k £62.46k £104.61k £23.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £725.48k £510.54k £666.84k £625.66k £483.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £189.71k £154.99k £231.18k £188.86k £164.15k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £335 £0 £287 £3.54k £6.71k
Income - Other £47.33k £29.72k £469 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £760.71k £685.86k £824.61k £888.86k £551.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.48k £5.74k £550 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.39k £4.82k £2.94k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £75.82k £71.45k £0 £33.68k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £74.74k