IMPACT FAMILY SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Specialist domestic violence and abuse services, bespoke children, young people and family services and specialist services such as Mediation and Counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £120,131 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 20 August 1998: Standard registration
- SUNDERLAND AND SOUTH TYNESIDE FAMILY MEDIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Therese Liddle | Chair | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Wilson | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Preacher | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Zoe Claire Blakemore | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harker | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Allan Whalley | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Farrar | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Lewis Christianson | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOAN HECKELS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN FREDERICK LINCOLN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £577.14k | £691.29k | £590.67k | £464.63k | £423.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £626.28k | £541.57k | £565.68k | £433.24k | £442.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £92.59k | £222.01k | N/A | £272.89k | £120.13k | |
|
Income from government grants | £268.04k | N/A | £321.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £447.05k | £394.90k | £466.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £117.18k | £204.85k | £105.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £55 | £28 | £17 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £12.86k | £91.51k | £18.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £626.28k | £541.57k | £514.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £51.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £91.03k | £0 | £83.94k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 JUNE 1998 AND 17 DECEMBER 1998 AND 9TH JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 1 AUGUST 2008. as amended on 28 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
To provide, for the benefit of the public, assistance through mediation, advice and guidance for adults and/or children in relation to any aspect of relationship breakdown and related issues in the North East of England, including, without limitation, by (a) providing advice and assistance through mediation to couples whose relationships have broken down; (b) providing support and specialist services to any adults, young people and children whose lives are affected by domestic abuse; (c) providing preventative services to schools, children, young people, and parents to help combat issues linked to healthy relationships, misogyny, violence against women and girls, and domestic abuse; (d) promoting and encouraging contact between children and their families through the provision of facilities known as "Contact Centres", and (e) providing training and support to agencies and organisations working with families, and with businesses to understand, manage and support people experiencing domestic abuse.
Area of benefit
SUNDERLAND, SOUTH TYNESIDE AND ADJACENT AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 122
South Shields Business Works
Henry Robson Way
SOUTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE33 1RF
- Phone:
- 07739524970
- Email:
- enquiries@impactfs.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window