Accounts and annual returns PARC (ESSEX)

Charity number: 1065854
Charity reporting is overdue by 1148 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 417 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 417 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 783 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 783 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1148 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1148 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window