Financial history NATIONAL MARITIME MUSEUM CORNWALL TRUST

Charity number: 1067884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.23m £2.01m £2.75m £2.14m £4.79m
Total expenditure £2.71m £1.93m £2.35m £3.24m £2.98m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £204.23k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £188.44k £897.07k £376.90k N/A £771.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £217.72k £15.65k £154.75k £140.79k £389.61k
Income - Other trading activities £875.10k £499.42k £1.19m £986.66k £1.23m
Income - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.25m £1.33m £937.47k £2.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £30.53k £31.55k £71.34k £78.44k £80.08k
Income - Other £0 £212.87k £4.48k £0 £1.01m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £250.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.49m £1.83m £2.02m £2.93m £2.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £224.72k £98.57k £330.92k £309.15k £382.69k
Expenditure - Governance £16.52k £17.85k £24.24k £26.60k £30.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.69k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0