THE POLITICAL STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1071825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Association exists to promote the development of political studies and to encourage education and the advancement of learning in the subject. To this end it publishes 4 journals and a magazine in partnership with Sage; arranges an annual conference, graduate conference and Heads of Department conference and supports an array of specialist research groups and activities for schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • POLITICAL STUDIES ASSOCIATION (Working name)
  • PSA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Donna Smith Trustee 14 June 2024
None on record
Dr Ana Isabel Nunes Trustee 14 June 2024
None on record
Professor Stefan Wolff Trustee 20 October 2023
None on record
Professor Nicholas Allen Trustee 16 June 2023
None on record
Professor Rose Gann Trustee 16 June 2023
None on record
Dr Heather Alberro Trustee 24 September 2022
None on record
Professor John Craig Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Professor Indrajit Roy Trustee 10 June 2022
DEVELOPMENT STUDIES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SOUTH ASIAN STUDIES
Received: On time
Dr Omar Khan Trustee 11 June 2021
None on record
Dr Manjeet Ramgotra Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Dr Andrew Mycock Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £995.56k £857.45k £756.20k £807.31k £863.38k
Total expenditure £933.75k £646.92k £608.82k £649.61k £618.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £992.69k £855.67k £754.18k £800.48k £843.27k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.87k £1.78k £2.01k £6.84k £20.10k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £933.75k £646.92k £608.82k £649.61k £618.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £37.79k £0 £5.18k £5.74k £12.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.73m £1.72m £1.70m £1.67m £1.64m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £885.20k £1.06m £1.20m £1.35m £1.33m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £729.01k £688.19k £656.52k £621.75k £325.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 2
Regent House
1-6 Pratt Mews
London
NW1 0AD
Phone:
02073212545