THE PHILIP ULLMANN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
supports Great Ormond Street Hospital and the Institute of Child Health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 24 June 1998: Standard registration
- 12 November 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1160024 GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21 | £10 | £10 | £10 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £225 | £360 | £360 | £360 | £25.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 29 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 31 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 29 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN INFANTS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR RESEARCH AND CLINICAL MANAGEMENT AT GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL FOR CHILDREN NHS TRUST AND THE INSTITUTE OF CHILD HEALTH LONDON AND ASSOCIATED CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISTIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window