SWANSEA AND BRECON MOTHERS UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the well-being of families by developing prayer and spiritual growth, studying family life, marriage and their place in society resourcing members to take practical action to improve conditions for families both nationally and in the communities in which they live.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
497 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Swansea
- Powys
Governance
- 26 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Brenda Knight | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Heather Culliford | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Felicity May Padley | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Eleanor Lewis | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Cora Lawrence | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Moira Bibby | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
JEANNE BARBARA HUGHES | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL WELLS | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.77k | £31.93k | £25.89k | £33.62k | £28.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.12k | £38.15k | £24.72k | £32.99k | £29.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 10 NOVEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE SPHERE OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Lamb Road
Penderyn
Aberdare
CF44 9JU
- Phone:
- 07496847592
- Email:
- helensecmu@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window