THE MATTISHALL MEMORIAL HALL & PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to supply a hall with the usual facilites for any local group to use, at present we are used be the local W.I. Society, the Mattishall Society, Voga Classes, Local Youth club meetings, Keep Fit and other exercise lessons, The Local Parish Council meetings. The hall is available for parties and weddings. The Playing field supports .the Village , Cricket and Bowls Clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 November 1998: Standard registration
- 12 March 2024: Funds received from 280812 MATTISHALL SOCIETY
- MATTISHALL VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Turner | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marc Laytham | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roisin Murray | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Rudling | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anita Rose | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Flatt | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip White | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Iris Kaye | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BURRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHERI SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSLIND CULYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.67k | £4.23k | £7.72k | £15.33k | £19.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.64k | £6.47k | £10.38k | £15.21k | £22.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 April 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MATTISHALL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MATTISHALL, NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
161 DEREHAM ROAD
MATTISHALL
DEREHAM
Norfolk
NR20 3PD
- Phone:
- 07941477820
- Email:
- mattishall.mhpfa@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window