FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH ARUNDEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support for the restoration preservation repair maintenance and reconstruction of the Parish Church of St Nicholas Arundel, West Sussex, and for the monuments fixtures fittings and stained glass in the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 February 1998: Standard registration
- ST NICHOLAS BUILDING TRUST (Working name)
- ST. NICHOLAS CHURCH ARUNDEL BUILDING TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JAMES CHALK | Chair | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Elinor Butler | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Catherine Fraser | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE PATRICIA PERRY | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Heather Butler | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Anne Maxwell | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Penfold | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
REVD DAVID ALAN TWINLEY | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham Kenneth Toole-Mackson | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|||||
DANIEL HOUGHTON HODSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.41k | £14.22k | £12.45k | £200.00k | £50.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.35k | £14.65k | £10.35k | £1.06k | £2.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 AUGUST 2009.
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE RESTORATION PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. NICHOLAS ("THE CHURCH") ARUNDEL IN THE COUNTY OF WEST SUSSEX IN THE DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER AND OF THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES AND STAINED GLASS IN THE CHURCH AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE SAID COUNTY OF WEST SUSSEX AND THE SAID DIOCESE TO PRESERVE REPAIR MAINTAIN AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCH BEING DECLARED REDUNDANT BY A PASTORAL SCHEME MADE UNDER THE PASTORAL MEASURE 1983 (OR ANY STATUTORY MODIFICATION OR RE-ENACTMENT THEREOF) OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES AND STAINED GLASS IN THE CHURCH AND THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING THERETO
Area of benefit
ARUNDEL IN THE DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER IN THE COUNTY OF WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 MALTRAVERS STREET
ARUNDEL
BN18 9BU
- Phone:
- 01903882262
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window