THE CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1071120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity endeavours to advance the Catholic faith by providing for and assisting poor, sick, disabled and infirm persons of all ages and in particular: - to help any such persons wishing to make a pilgrimage to Lourdes or to any other place of religious pilgrimage and - to be financially responsible for the organisation of such a pilgrimage.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £36,914
Total expenditure: £69,781

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PAGE Chair 13 January 2020
THE SANDYS TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
MATTHEW BETTS Trustee 06 November 2023
YOU OKAY, DOC?
Received: On time
THE LIVING BY GIVING TRUST
Received: On time
Rev PIOTR WYGNANSKI Trustee 06 November 2023
OHP Trust
Received: On time
Dr Rosemary Belderbos Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
SIMON GALLOP Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
ANNE HOSKINS Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
ANNA FRANCES MACER-WRIGHT Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
THERESA MAHON Trustee 15 April 2016
None on record
Rt Rev Paul Hendricks Trustee
CARITAS SOCIAL ACTION
Received: On time
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON
Received: On time
BUTLER TRUST
Received: On time
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
REDMOND'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST
Received: On time
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK)
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND
Received: On time
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST
Received: On time
CANON TIERNEY TRUST
Received: On time
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST
Received: On time
ROBINSON BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL
Received: On time
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON)
Received: On time
DUFFY BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE INCORPORATED CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY
Received: On time
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST
Received: On time
DEPTFORD POOR FUND
Received: On time
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48.87k £10.53k £14.92k £25.34k £36.91k
Total expenditure £53.37k £34.92k £21.96k £42.06k £69.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Purbeck Close
AYLESBURY
HP21 9UU
Phone:
01296435421