NATIONAL ACTIVITY PROVIDERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NAPA is the professional association for Activity Providers and activity provision for care and support services in the UK. We set activity standards and provide professional and practice development services for activity and care teams. Our members provide care and support services to adults these include care homes, supported living, day services, hospitals and community services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 July 1998: Standard registration
- 03 July 2024: Funds received from 1131498 THE GROW OLD DISGRACEFULLY CHARITABLE TRUST
- NAPA (Working name)
- NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR PROVIDERS OF ACTIVITIES FOR OLDER PEOPLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Henry Dixon Thomas | Chair | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Scarlet Leatham | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Paine MBE | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chinno WILLS-COLE | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Goldsmith | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ascott | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WATKINSON | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.53k | £353.22k | £382.87k | £421.21k | £421.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £318.46k | £305.77k | £362.76k | £431.89k | £471.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ADVICE SUPPORT AND EDUCATION FOR THOSE WHO ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES FOR OLDER PERSONS IN ESTABLISHMENTS WHICH PROVIDE SERVICES OR CARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NAPA
c/o Cansdales Business Advisers Ltd
St. Marys Court
The Broadway
Amersham
Buckingh
- Phone:
- 08001585503
- Email:
- hilary@napa-activities.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window